U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:01-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hubbard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.