U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00021-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 15, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 06, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • May 20, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 20, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Restricted Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Mail Returned]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Restricted Document]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.