U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report re: Probation/Supervised Release (35)]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 31, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.