U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Bond]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Response]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Attachment]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Reply to Response]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Reply to Response]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response to Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.