U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arnold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Change of Address]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.