U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Charlie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 19, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.