U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 18, 2020: [Response]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 04, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • February 05, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 19, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 08, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 25, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 24, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 24, 2017: [Remark]
  • October 17, 2017: [Remark]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Rebuttal]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [In Chambers Conference]
  • December 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.