U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 16, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • December 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.