U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Emory
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.