U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brantley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 19, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 19, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • September 14, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 14, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.