U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 09, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.