U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2020: [Change of Address]
  • April 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 06, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 09, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.