U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 16, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 02, 2021: [Affidavit]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 19, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Reply to Response]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • August 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [New Trial]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • July 07, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 11, 2019: [Attachment]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Transcript]
  • July 09, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • May 10, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 14, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • January 14, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2019: [Seal]
  • January 08, 2019: [Seal]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 03, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 03, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 02, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Remark]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment NOV]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 23, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 22, 2018: [New Trial]
  • October 22, 2018: [Acquittal]
  • October 22, 2018: [Judgment NOV]
  • October 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 21, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • September 21, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
  • September 17, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • September 17, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
  • September 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 15, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 13, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 09, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 20, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Remark]
  • December 20, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 18, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 03, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • September 21, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 21, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2017: [Waiver]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 15, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 01, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • February 27, 2017: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • February 27, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • February 27, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 09, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • February 08, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • December 13, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 11, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 08, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 14, 2016: [Joinder]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 30, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 09, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.