U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 04, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • October 03, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 02, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 27, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • September 26, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • August 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 24, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 14, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • June 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Produce]
  • June 21, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 18, 2017: [Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 26, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.