U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 25, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 24, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 03, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 03, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2016: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.