U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 03, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 31, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 11, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Review of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 01, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 08, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 08, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.