U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 24, 2016: [Quash]
  • October 07, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 07, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.