U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 07, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.