U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ochoa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 18, 2018: [Unseal Case]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 13, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 07, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.