U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrews et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2018: [Response]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 03, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • June 14, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.