U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brumfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Reply to Response]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Letter]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • August 10, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 27, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • June 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Produce]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Bond]
  • February 13, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • February 08, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 07, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 02, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 06, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 06, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.