U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fletcher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • September 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.