U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 20, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Psychiatric Report]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2016: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.