U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 01, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 01, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.