U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 04, 2021: [Rebuttal]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Remark]
  • September 18, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • September 18, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.