U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11496
  • Case Name: First Path, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Response]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Statement]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order from BAP re: Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.