U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Reassignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Services/Probation - Request/Memo/Summons/Warrant]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services/Probation Request]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 08, 2021: [Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 06, 2021: [Memorandum - not related to a motion]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Rescheduling]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order On Excludable Delay]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order Of Detention]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order On Excludable Delay]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order On Excludable Delay]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • September 16, 2019: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • August 08, 2019: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • July 10, 2019: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order Of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • June 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.