U.S. District Court for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00331-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LABRECK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 03, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 12, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Issued]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Financial Declaration]
  • November 21, 2019: [Bond Set/Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.