U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00358
  • Case Name: ENTERPRISE FM TRUST v. GLOBAL ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.