U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00469
  • Case Name: DOYLE v. BABINE, COUNCILOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Objection]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Objection]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Objection]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order for Service]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.