U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00396
  • Case Name: US BANK NA SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO LASALLE BANK NA AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE HOLDERS OF THE WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES WMALT SERIES v. PIKE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.