U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00329
  • Case Name: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. WATERMAN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.