U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00466
  • Case Name: NORRIS v. CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.