U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00418
  • Case Name: KLINGES v. POMERLEAU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [SEALED Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • March 21, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.