U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00264
  • Case Name: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. GAUTHIER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.