U.S. District Court for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00305-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 05, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Speedy Trial Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2019: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Financial Declaration]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.