U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00455
  • Case Name: ROBERTSON v. BARBER FOODS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.