U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00384
  • Case Name: SALVATO v. PORTLAND HOUSING AUTHORITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order for Service]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.