U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00424
  • Case Name: PURINGTON-BAILEY v. WALMART INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.