U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00420
  • Case Name: NCTA - INTERNET & TELEVISION ASSOCIATION v. FREY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.