U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00417
  • Case Name: VIOLETTE v. TURGEON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.