U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00410
  • Case Name: COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE INC et al v. MILLS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.