U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00406
  • Case Name: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION v. COMMISSIONER OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF MARINE RESOURCES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Objection]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order for Service]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.