U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00225
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PURVIS HOME IMPROVEMENT CO INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.