U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00280
  • Case Name: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. TUTTLE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.