U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00361
  • Case Name: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC v. THOMAS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.