U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00306
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. CUNNINGHAM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.