U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00382
  • Case Name: FEDEQ DV004 LLC et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.