U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00305
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. LACZ et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.