U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00397
  • Case Name: HERRICK v. MONTEJANO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.